Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/11/2021 at 22:48:57 (UTC).

SHEILA MARIE DIAZ OTERO, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF ELIZABETH OTERO-RIVE vsUNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 SHEILA MARIE DIAZ OTERO, AS P R OF THE ESTATE OF ELIZABETH OTERO-RIVE vsUNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC was filed as a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, Christopher. C. and Nash, C.. Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0600

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, C.. Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF ELIZABETH OTERO-RIVE, SHEILA MARIE DIAZ OTERO, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE

109 S. Edison Avenue

Tampa, FL 33606

SHEILA MARIE DIAZ OTERO, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF ELIZABETH OTERO-RIVE

109 S. Edison Avenue

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

F/K/A FLORIDA HOSPITAL TAMPA,, UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, D/B/A ADVENTHEALTH TAM

14055 Riveredge Drive

Suite 250, FL 33637

UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.

14055 Riveredge Drive

Suite 250, FL 33637

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAGANO , JAMES MICHAEL

Attorney at STOCKHAM LAW GROUP

109 S Edison Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

HUNTER , C HOWARD, III

Attorney at HILL WARD HENDERSON

Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33601

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/13/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/03/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/25/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/22/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/22/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/22/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SHEILA MARIE DIAZ OTERO, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF ELIZABETH OTERO-RIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SHEILA MARIE DIAZ OTERO, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF ELIZABETH OTERO-RIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SHEILA MARIE DIAZ OTERO, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF ELIZABETH OTERO-RIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SHEILA MARIE DIAZ OTERO, AS P.R. OF THE ESTATE OF ELIZABETH OTERO-RIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where F/K/A PHYSICAL THERAPY NOW HOLDINGS is a litigant

Latest cases where University Community Hospital, Inc., D/B/A Florida Hospital Tampa is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNTER , C HOWARD, III