This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/18/2021 at 10:46:03 (UTC).

Eskew, Marianne vs Seminole Hard Tribe of Florida

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Eskew, Marianne filed an Other lawsuit against Seminole Hard Tribe of Florida. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Holder, P. Gregory, Holder, Gregory. P and Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9311

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Holder, P. Gregory

Holder, Gregory. P

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eskew, Marianne

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

Seminole Hard Tribe of Florida

6300 Stirling Road

Hollywood, FL 33024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CATALANO , JAMES ALFRED

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN

201 N Franklin St Fl 7

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

SCHELLHASE , MARK DAVID

225 Ne Mizner Blvd Ste 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/21/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

11/30/2020: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/01/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/30/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/30/2020: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/30/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Seminole Hard Tribe of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Seminole Hard Tribe of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Seminole Hard Tribe of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Seminole Hard Tribe of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Seminole Hard Tribe of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Seminole Hard Tribe of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Seminole Hard Tribe of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eskew, Marianne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eskew, Marianne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eskew, Marianne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eskew, Marianne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eskew, Marianne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eskew, Marianne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eskew, Marianne

    Read MoreRead Less