This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/23/2023 at 14:59:48 (UTC).

ESA P PORTFOLIO vs Carey, Tiera

Case Summary

On 12/04/2022 ESA P PORTFOLIO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Carey, Tiera. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6867

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESA P PORTFOLIO

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant

Carey, Tiera

Tampa, FL 33607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREWS , FORREST LEE, Jr

Attorney at LYDECKER LLP

1221 Brickell Ave Fl 19

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/04/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/04/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

12/04/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/04/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/05/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/07/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/29/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MOTION TO - FOR

01/06/2023: MOTION TO - FOR

ANSWER

01/06/2023: ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Carey, Tiera;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: DETERMINE RENT; Additional Info: Defendant: Carey, Tiera;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ESA P PORTFOLIO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Carey, Tiera;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ESA P PORTFOLIO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ESA P PORTFOLIO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ESA P PORTFOLIO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ESA P PORTFOLIO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less