This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 11/03/2021 at 04:39:17 (UTC).

ENVISION CREDIT UNION vs Scott, Stephens R

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 ENVISION CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Scott, Stephens R. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam, Valkenburg, Miriam. V., Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9106

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENVISION CREDIT UNION

C/O John Blair Boyd, Esquire P.O. Box 3637

Tallahassee, FL 32315-3637

Defendant

Scott, Stephens R

Riverview, FL 33578

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYD , JOHN BLAIR

Attorney at SORENSON VAN LEUVEN LAW FIRM

Po Box 3637

Tallahassee, FL 32315

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/27/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/21/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

06/21/2021: COMPLAINT

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/22/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/21/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/21/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/21/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/21/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION O PER AO S-2021-057

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ENVISION CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Scott, Stephens R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Scott, Stephens R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default; Comment: DEFAULT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ENVISION CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ENVISION CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: Stephens R. Scott 16th day of July, 2021; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ENVISION CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Scott, Stephens R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ENVISION CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ENVISION CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ENVISION CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ENVISION CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ENVISION CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVISION CREDIT UNION is a litigant