This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 11/04/2021 at 12:10:34 (UTC).

Enterprise Leasing Company Of Florida LLC vs Jones, Shuah

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 Enterprise Leasing Company Of Florida LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jones, Shuah. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle, Ober, Joelle. Ann, Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2423

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Enterprise Leasing Company Of Florida Llc

806 Douglas Rd., South Tower Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

Jones, Shuah

Tampa, FL 33614-5846

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN , JOSEPH F

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN PA

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/02/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/02/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/01/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/01/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/01/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/01/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION O PER AO S-2021-057

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: SHUAH JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Jones, Shuah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Enterprise Leasing Company Of Florida LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Enterprise Leasing Company Of Florida LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Enterprise Leasing Company Of Florida LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Enterprise Leasing Company Of Florida LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Enterprise Leasing Company Of Florida LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Enterprise Leasing Company Of Florida LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Enterprise Leasing Company of Florida LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN , JOSEPH F