Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/10/2021 at 21:33:10 (UTC).

EASON, CLARIDELL C - Estate

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 EASON, CLARIDELL C - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0826

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioners and Trustees

WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

Jacksonville, FL 32224

PHELAN, GAYLE

Tampa, FL 36618

ZACKS, CHARLES MATTHEW

Atlanta, GA 30307

IMMING, JACKSON STEVEN

Decatur, GA 30030

CLARIDELL C EASON REVOCABLE TRUST, DTD

3934 Chicora Wood Place

Jacksonville, FL 32224

CLAYWELL, HENRY ARTHUR

Tampa, FL 33618

FERRERO, DIEGO ANTONIO

Westfield, NJ 07090

ZACKS, MADELEINE RYAN

Atlanta, GA 30307

RINEHART, ELZABETH GRACE

Centennial, CO 80111

HERNANDEZ, SOFIA SAMANTHA

Naples, FL 34104

FERRERO, ENZO ANTONIO

Westfield, NJ 07090

ZACKS, ANDREW PHELAN

Atlanta, GA 30307

LAROSA, MICHAEL ANTONIO

St Petersburg, FL 33702

HERNANDEZ, LUCAS WILLIAM

Urbana, IL 61802

WRIGHT, JONES JUSTIN

Encinitas, CA 92024

WRIGHT, VEDA RISA

Encinitas, CA 92024

EASON, ELIZABETH K

Longwood, FL 32779

FERRERO, ROMULO SEBASTIAN

Westfield, NJ 07090

LAROSA, OLIVIA MARIE

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

Decedent

EASON, CLARIDELL C

Tampa, FL 33624

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioner and Trustee Attorney

DICKEY , ADRIA BEENHAKKER

Attorney at ADRIA BEENHAKKER DICKEY, PA

3415 W Fletcher Ave

Tampa, FL 33618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSATISFACTION-REL OF CLAIM; Comment: AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE - WFL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLA EST TAX DUE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF INFORMAL REQUEST FROM; Comment: CG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $736.74, ADRIA@ADRIADICKEYLAW.COM 06/08/2020; Additional Info: Claimant: AMR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERS REP; Comment: BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: LEIGH ALLISON LAROSA AND MICHAEL FRANCIS LAROSA FOR OLIVIA MARIE LAROSA; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: ROMULO SEBASTIAN FERRERO; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: SOFIA SAMANTHA HERNANDEZ; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: AMY REBECCA WRIGHT AND JUSTIN KENNETH WRIGHT FOR VEDA RISA WRIGHT; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF PROBATE PROCEEDING TO TRUSTEE, ELIZABETH LOUISE WASHINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: ELIZABETH LOUISE WASHINGTON A/K/A ELIZABETH CLAYWELL WASHINGTON; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: ELIZABETH LOUISE WASHINGTON A/K/A ELIZABETH CLAYWELL WASHINGTON; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST; Additional Info: Beneficiary: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Personal Representative: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Petitioner: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE; Trustee: WASHINGTON, ELIZABETH LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DICKEY , ADRIA BEENHAKKER