This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/20/2021 at 01:08:22 (UTC).

Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc. vs Mathew, Salim

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Mathew, Salim. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0176

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

11268 Winthrop Main St., Ste. 102

Riverview, FL 33578

Defendants

of Salim Mathew, Unknown Spouse

Valrico, FL 33594

Mathew, Salim

Valrico, FL 33594

UNKNOWN TENANT/OCCUPANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT/OCCUPANT #2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANDT , ALLISON JEAN

Attorney at ALLISON J. BRANDT, P.A.

1219 Millennium Pkwy Ste 138

Brandon, FL 33511

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/04/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/04/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/04/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/05/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/05/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

05/04/2021: COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

05/04/2021: LIS PENDENS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 07/16/2021 DEFT. UNKNOWN TENANT/ OCCUPANT #1; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 07/16/2021 DEFT. UNKNOWN TENANT/ OCCUPANT #2; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 06/10/2021 DEFT. SALIM MATHEW; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: ( AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Additional Info: Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT/OCCUPANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: ( AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Additional Info: Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT/OCCUPANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Eaglewood Estate Homeowners Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDT , ALLISON JEAN