This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/13/2020 at 02:21:42 (UTC).

EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC vs Lopez Hernandez, Angel Luis

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Lopez Hernandez, Angel Luis. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cook, J.. Martha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1106

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cook, J.. Martha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

1 Corporate Drive, Suite 360

Lake Zurich, IL 60047

Defendants

Vista Palms Community Association, Inc

12906 Tampa Oaks Blvd., Suite 100

Temple Terrace, FL 33637

Vista Palms Clubhouse, LLC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Suncoast Credit Union

6801 E. Hillsborough Ave

Tampa, FL 33610

Caban, Melissa

Wimauma, FL 33598

The Unknown Spouse of Melissa Caban

Wimauma, FL 33598

Lopez Hernandez, Angel Luis

Wimauma, FL 33598

The Unknown Spouse of Angel Luis Lopez-Hernandez

Wimauma, FL 33598

The Unknown Tenant in Possession

Wimauma, FL 33598

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAREY , MOLLY E, Esquire

Attorney at PADGETT LAW GROUP

6267 Old Water Oak Rd Ste 203

Tallahassee, FL 32312-3858

SMALBACH , HARRISON SAMUEL

Attorney at BIZ2CREDIT

1 Penn Plz Fl 45

New York, NY 10119

NORIEGA , WILLIAM LOUIS, Jr

Attorney at PADGETT LAW GROUP

6267 Old Water Oak Rd Ste 203

Tallahassee, FL 32312

CAREY , MOLLY EMMA

Attorney at PADGETT LAW GROUP

6267 Old Water Oak Rd Ste 203

Tallahassee, FL 32312-3858

SANCHEZ-BARCIA , LOURDES MARIA

Attorney at ROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ & SCHNEID, P.L.

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorneys

QUAM , DARRIN JAY

Attorney at STEARNS WEAVER MILLER

401 E Jackson St Ste 2100

Tampa, FL 33602

PRASSE , BARBARA JANE

Attorney at BARBARA J. PRASSE, PA

Po Box 173497

Tampa, FL 33672

PRASSE-ANDERSON, BARBARA JANE

Attorney at BARBARA J. PRASSE, PA

Po Box 173497

Tampa, FL 33672

THORPE , DAVID

Attorney at THE THORPE LAW FIRM, P.A.

7819 N Dale Mabry Hwy Ste 108

Tampa, FL 33614

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

10/16/2019: MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

03/20/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

Signature Page For Clerk's Default

03/20/2019: Signature Page For Clerk's Default

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/18/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/28/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

LIS PENDENS

01/30/2019: LIS PENDENS

STIPULATION FOR COUNSEL SUBSTITUTION

06/25/2020: STIPULATION FOR COUNSEL SUBSTITUTION

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

05/23/2020: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/10/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

06/08/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

AVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/26/2020: AVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AGREED ORDER

03/20/2020: AGREED ORDER

MOTION TO STRIKE

03/29/2019: MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

03/15/2019: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/30/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR COUNSEL SUBSTITUTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AS CO-COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS- Lourdes Sanchez Barcia, Esquire; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Defendant: Caban, Melissa; Defendant: Lopez Hernandez, Angel Luis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: Caban, Melissa; Defendant: Lopez Hernandez, Angel Luis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: CONTINUE SCHEDULING MEDIATION; Additional Info: Defendant: Caban, Melissa; Defendant: Lopez Hernandez, Angel Luis; Defendant: Suncoast Credit Union; Defendant: The Unknown Spouse of Angel Luis Lopez-Hernandez; Defendant: The Unknown Spouse of Melissa Caban; Defendant: The Unknown Tenant in Possession; Defendant: Vista Palms Clubhouse, LLC; Defendant: Vista Palms Community Association, Inc; Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC; Private Attorney: CAREY , MOLLY E, Esquire; Private Attorney: PRASSE , BARBARA JANE; Private Attorney: QUAM , DARRIN JAY; Private Attorney: THORPE , DAVID; Date Signed: 06/08/2020; Judicial Officer: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE; Comment: SCHEDULING MEDIATION; Additional Info: Defendant: Caban, Melissa; Defendant: Lopez Hernandez, Angel Luis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: ON MOTION FOR REFERREL TO MEDIATION **GRANTED** 03/20/20 MJC; Additional Info: Defendant: Lopez Hernandez, Angel Luis; Date Signed: 03/20/2020; Judicial Officer: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: BY JUDICIAL AGAINST ANGEL LUIS LOPEZ HERNANDEZ AND MELISSA CABAN; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketCertification of Original Note Possession FS702.015(4); Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less