This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/21/2020 at 05:58:17 (UTC).

Dwyer, Darlene vs American Traditions Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Dwyer, Darlene filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against American Traditions Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee, Moore. Laurel, Tesche Arkin, J. Caroline and Tesche Arkin, Caroline. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0373

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lee, Moore. Laurel

Tesche Arkin, J. Caroline

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dwyer, Darlene

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

American Traditions Insurance Company

Post Office Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOODNOW , JAMES, Esquire

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.

201 N Franklin St, 8Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

GOODNOW , JAMES CHARLES, Jr

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.

One Tampa City Center 201 N Franklin St Fl 7

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

BURKE , WILLIAM R

Attorney at ZINOBER DIANA, P.A.

150 2Nd Ave N Ste 1170

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/26/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/06/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/06/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/14/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/11/2019: COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/11/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/11/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE

01/11/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2020039839; Judge: Tesche Arkin, Caroline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene; Private Attorney: GOODNOW , JAMES, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: American Traditions Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene; Private Attorney: GOODNOW , JAMES, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Comment: DEFENDANT'S AMENDED; Additional Info: Defendant: American Traditions Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF NATHANIEL COX; Additional Info: Defendant: American Traditions Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Comment: DUCES TECUM OF NATHANIEL COX; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene; Private Attorney: GOODNOW , JAMES, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketSUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION; Comment: NATHANIEL COX, SET FOR DEC. 10, 2019 AT 10:30 AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene; Private Attorney: GOODNOW , JAMES, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE; Comment: OF SPOLIATION LETTER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dwyer, Darlene

    Read MoreRead Less