This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 07:44:40 (UTC).

Duszynski, Robert vs TAMPA PORT AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 Duszynski, Robert filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TAMPA PORT AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8506

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duszynski, Robert

Land O' Lakes, FL 34639

Defendants

MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC.

By Serving Ra: Ct Corporation Services 1200 South Pine Island Rd.

Plantation, FL 33324

TAMPA PORT AUTHORITY

By Serving: Paul Anderson 1101 Channelside Dr.

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIANNA , MISTY MORGAN

Attorney at KEMP RUGE & GREEN

11567 Trinity Blvd

Trinity, FL 34655

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/13/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

01/12/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/05/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/04/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

12/16/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

12/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/15/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/08/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/08/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/10/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/10/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/10/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/10/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/10/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/10/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/10/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/91757641087 MEETING ID 917 5764 1087PASSWORD 973927; Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Duszynski, Robert;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA PORT AUTHORITY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Duszynski, Robert;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Duszynski, Robert;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Duszynski, Robert;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Duszynski, Robert;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Duszynski, Robert;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Duszynski, Robert;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Duszynski, Robert;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Duszynski, Robert;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3; Additional Info: Defendant: MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC.; Defendant: TAMPA PORT AUTHORITY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Tampa Port Authority is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIANNA , MISTY MORGAN