Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/17/2021 at 01:03:23 (UTC).

DUNN, DALTON vs MARTINEZ, ANNAELI S

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 DUNN, DALTON filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MARTINEZ, ANNAELI S. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ayers, Kelly. A, Ayers, A. Kelly and Ayers, Kelly A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5277

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ayers, Kelly. A

Ayers, A. Kelly

Ayers, Kelly A

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DUNN, DALTON ALEXANDER

Tampa, FL 33602

DUNN, DALTON

Tampa, FL 33613

Respondent

MARTINEZ, ANNAELI S

Tampa, FL 33614

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DODDS , LEESAANN NICOLE

Attorney at DODDS LAW

412 E Madison St Ste 908

Tampa, FL 33602

Respondent Attorney

AHMED , SYED SHARIK

Attorney at LEGAL ADVOCATE GROUP, P.A.

2011 W Cleveland St Ste A

Tampa, FL 33606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • HearingCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 402 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Ayers, Kelly A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION; Additional Info: Child 1: DUNN, HARPER ALEXANDRA; Petitioner: DUNN, DALTON; Private Attorney: AHMED , SYED SHARIK; Private Attorney: DODDS , LEESAANN NICOLE; Respondent: MARTINEZ, ANNAELI S; Date Signed: 06/30/2021; Judicial Officer: Ayers, Kelly A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketORDER ON - TO - FOR (FAMILY); Comment: PARTIAL TEMPORARY STIPULATED PARENTING PLAN AND NO CONTACT ORDER; Additional Info: Date Signed: 06/15/2021; Judicial Officer: Ayers, Kelly A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Respondent: MARTINEZ, ANNAELI S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS COMPLETED; Additional Info: Petitioner: DUNN, DALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS COMPLETED; Additional Info: Petitioner: DUNN, DALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER; Comment: OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Respondent: MARTINEZ, ANNAELI S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: FOR PETT; Additional Info: Petitioner: DUNN, DALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSTANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Respondent: MARTINEZ, ANNAELI S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: DUNN, DALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: DUNN, DALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: DUNN, DALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: DUNN, DALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Petitioner: DUNN, DALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (Initial Case Filing); Additional Info: Petitioner: DUNN, DALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT; Additional Info: Petitioner: DUNN, DALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DODDS , LEESAANN NICOLE