This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 17:35:21 (UTC).

Doug Belden, Hillsborough County Tax Collector vs Delinquent 2019 Tangible Property Taxpayers

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Doug Belden, Hillsborough County Tax Collector filed an Other lawsuit against Delinquent 2019 Tangible Property Taxpayers. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6054

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Defendants

FMR PAINTING, FELIPE RODRIGUEZ

QPHARMA INC

HOOPS & FITNESS ACADEMY, RICHARD DRIZZABN

M S SUPPLY & HOME HEALTH CO, FARIE SANCHIS

CREATED IMAGE BARBER SHOP, THOMAS BARRIENTOS

SAME SAME BUT DIFFERENT INC

RENTACRATE LLC

CHIRO-QUICK LLC, JAMES BATSON JR

ICESMILE LLC, NUAN MING ZHENG

SPA 36

DELICIAS LATINAS

A & M AUTO WORX

HALL ON FRANKLIN THE

OPES HEALTH

UHLER REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS

BLADES OF GREEN INC

VILLAGE INN PANCAKE HOUSE #51, DOW SHERWOOD CORPORATION

COLORADO HEALTH & YOUTH LLC, KATHLEEN COLORADO

FLAKOS BARBER SHOP LLC

NEWLINE MARKETING LLC, GABOR HAJDU

1,031 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FITZGERALD , BRIAN THOMAS

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 27

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

EVIDENCE DATA SHEET

11/12/2020: EVIDENCE DATA SHEET

ORDER ON - TO - FOR

03/18/2021: ORDER ON - TO - FOR

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

10/12/2020: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

11/18/2020: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/12/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

COMPLAINT

07/30/2020: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/30/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

RESPONSE

09/28/2020: RESPONSE

LETTER FROM CLERK

08/11/2020: LETTER FROM CLERK

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Additional Info: Defendant: PIVOT ACADEMY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Additional Info: Defendant: PARKING LOT STRIPING SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Additional Info: Defendant: KENT CLARK LLC, ALYSHA VIGUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Additional Info: Defendant: COOL GATOR ENTERPRISES INC, HAROLD WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2021138447; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketORDER ON - TO - FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON - TO - FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR ORDER RATIFYING AND CONFIRMING ISSUANCE OF DELIQUENT TANGIBLE PERSONAL PROPERTY TAX WARRANTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doug Belden, Hillsborough County Tax Collector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: Returning check #065182 in the amount of $3,080.00. Fees have already been paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTORNEY RE: FILING AND EXTRA DEFENDANT'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doug Belden, Hillsborough County Tax Collector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doug Belden, Hillsborough County Tax Collector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: BRIAN T. FITZGERALD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doug Belden, Hillsborough County Tax Collector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: BRIAN T. FITZGERALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doug Belden, Hillsborough County Tax Collector

    Read MoreRead Less