This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/12/2022 at 00:04:42 (UTC).

DORRION, JOYCE vs HEALTHY HOME OF ALLERGY & INDOOR AIR POLLUTION PRODUCTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/31/2022 DORRION, JOYCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HEALTHY HOME OF ALLERGY INDOOR AIR POLLUTION PRODUCTS, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Battles, Emmett. L, Battles, Emmett L and Battles, L. Emmett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2687

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Battles, Emmett. L

Battles, Emmett L

Battles, L. Emmett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DORRION, JOYCE

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

HEALTHY HOME OF ALLERGY & INDOOR AIR POLLUTION PRODUCTS, INC.

4211 East Busch Blvd Suite G

Tampa, FL 33617

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FULMER , PAUL BRYAN, III

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN

201 N Franklin St Fl 7

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/31/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/31/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

03/31/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/31/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/01/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

04/01/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

04/25/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

MOTION TO DISMISS

05/25/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/16/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: WEBEX # - 904-900-2303 ACCESS CODE - 132 668 1405 Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: JULY 27, 2022 @ 11:15AM- VIA WEBEX; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DORRION, JOYCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: JOYCE DORRIAN'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: HEALTHY HOME OF ALLERGY & INDOOR AIR POLLUTION PRODUCTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 04/20/2022 DEFT HEALTHY HOME OF ALLERGY & INDOOR AIR POLLUTION PRODUCTS, INC; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DORRION, JOYCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: HEALTHY HOME OF ALLERGY & INDOOR AIR POLLUTION PRODUCTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DORRION, JOYCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DORRION, JOYCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DORRION, JOYCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DORRION, JOYCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fulmer III, Paul Bryan