This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/10/2020 at 10:18:59 (UTC).

Dorey, Sandra Lee vs University of South Florida Board of Trustees

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 Dorey, Sandra Lee filed an Other lawsuit against University of South Florida Board of Trustees. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1778

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dorey, Sandra Lee

Tampa, FL 33606

Dorey, Robert

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

Sun Dome, Inc.

4202 E Fowler Avenue, Sun 141

Tampa, FL 33620

University of South Florida Board of Trustees

4202 E. Fowler Avenue, Cgs401

Tampa, FL 33620

Spectra

3601 S. Broad Street

Philadelphia, PA 19148

GLOBAL SPECTRUM, L.P.

3601 South Broad Street

Philadelphia, PA 19148

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DABOLL , BONNIE CAROL

Attorney at JOHNSON DABOLL ANDERSON PLLC

2011 W Cleveland St Ste F

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorneys

BLEVINS , JEROME BARTON

Attorney at BRADHAM, BENSON ET.AL

4141 Central Ave

Saint Petersburg, FL 33713

RINE , JOHN AUSTIN

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

401 E Jackson St Ste 3400

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/27/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/27/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

UNSIGNED ORDER FILED

02/19/2019: UNSIGNED ORDER FILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/12/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

02/04/2019: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/29/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/25/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/17/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/07/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

03/07/2019: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/25/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/13/2019: REQUEST FOR COPIES

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/12/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

02/04/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/07/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/07/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/04/2018: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Sun Dome, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Sun Dome, Inc.; Defendant: University of South Florida Board of Trustees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Sun Dome, Inc.; Defendant: University of South Florida Board of Trustees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTORNEY RE: SUMMONS bdaboll@jdalegal.com ; aglisson@jdalegal.com ; djohnson@jdalegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dorey, Robert; Plaintiff: Dorey, Sandra Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBAL SPECTRUM, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where SPECTRA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DABOLL , BONNIE CAROL