This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/06/2021 at 07:24:49 (UTC).

Done Right Auto Glass, Llc vs Usaa Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Done Right Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Usaa Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, S. James, Moody, James S, III and Moody, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5226

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, S. James

Moody, James S, III

Moody, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Done Right Auto Glass, Llc., As Assignee Of, Dominick Felicio

Felicio, Dominick

Done Right Auto Glass, Llc

808 West Deleon St.

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

Usaa Casualty Insurance Company

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER P. CALKIN P.A.

808 W De Leon St

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

TOBIN , LEE ANDREW

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/13/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/13/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/19/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 510 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Moody, James S, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCOURT TICKET; Comment: *PRE-TRIAL*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Usaa Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Done Right Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Done Right Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Done Right Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Done Right Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DONE RIGHT AUTO GLASS is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P