This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/05/2022 at 10:13:09 (UTC).

Done Right Auto Glass, Llc vs Allstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Done Right Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6740

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Done Right Auto Glass, Llc

808 West Deleon St.

Tampa, FL 33606

REYNOLDS, RONALD

Defendant

Allstate Insurance Company

C/O Cfo 200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER P. CALKIN P.A.

808 W De Leon St

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

FLUKER, TACARRA SHANTA

Attorney at ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

4443 Lyons Rd Ste 206

Coconut Creek, FL 33073

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/26/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/26/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/26/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/26/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/27/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/27/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/11/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/25/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/25/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AS IMPROPER DEFENDANT, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION, AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Done Right Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Done Right Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Done Right Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Done Right Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Done Right Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DONE RIGHT AUTO GLASS is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P