This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/07/2022 at 01:51:54 (UTC).

Doctor's Pain Management Group Inc.,RUFFNER, NICHOLAS vs Geico Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Doctor's Pain Management Group Inc ,RUFFNER, NICHOLAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico Indemnity Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7372

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Doctor's Pain Management Group Inc.

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

RUFFNER, NICHOLAS

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SULLIVAN , AMY TESS

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

DOUMAS , JENNIFER MARIE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/27/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

07/27/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/28/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/31/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/31/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/31/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/31/2022: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/31/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant