This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 11:00:08 (UTC).

Doc Schroeder, Inc. vs Direct General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Doc Schroeder, Inc filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against Direct General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, M. Frances and Perrone, Frances. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4347

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, M. Frances

Perrone, Frances. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Doc Schroeder, Inc. A/A/O Larry Cochran

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Cochran, Larry

Doc Schroeder, Inc.

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

Direct General Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CURA , LORIE SCHAEFER

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

111 2Nd Ave Ne Ste 1600

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant Attorneys

SLIGER , CHAD THOMAS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JACK MARC PEREZ

5907 Hampton Oaks Pkwy Ste E

Tampa, FL 33610

LIEBGOLD , MICHAEL PETER

Attorney at AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

6227 Gannetdale Dr

Lithia, FL 33547

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/21/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

04/26/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/02/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/02/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PRIVILEGE LOG

03/02/2022: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/02/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/16/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/16/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/16/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/16/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/04/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

01/22/2022: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doc Schroeder, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doc Schroeder, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doc Schroeder, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doc Schroeder, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doc Schroeder, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doc Schroeder, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doc Schroeder, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doc Schroeder, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOC SCHROEDER INC., D/B/A BACK PAIN RELIEF CLINIC, is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURA , LORIE SCHAEFER