This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/31/2022 at 13:17:19 (UTC).

DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7180

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC A/A/O PAUL HEFFELFINGER

521 East S.R. 434

Longwood, FL 32750

DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

521 East S.R. 434

Longwood, FL 32750

HEFFELFINGER, PAUL

Defendants

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Cfo Service Of Process Section P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFFMAN , BRUCE HENRY

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF BRUCE H. KAUFFMAN, PA

4409 Hoffner Ave Ste 194

Orlando, FL 32812

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/05/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/05/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/07/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/07/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/07/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/20/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC; Plaintiff: HEFFELFINGER, PAUL; Private Attorney: KAUFFMAN , BRUCE HENRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant