This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/09/2022 at 02:48:37 (UTC).

DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, Michael. J and Hooi, J. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9731

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC A/A/O ESTHER STOKES

521 East S.R. 434

Longwood, FL 32750

DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

521 East S.R. 434

Longwood, FL 32750

STOKES, ESTHER

Defendants

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Cfo Servic Eof Process Section P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFFMAN , BRUCE HENRY

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF BRUCE H. KAUFFMAN, PA

4409 Hoffner Ave Ste 194

Orlando, FL 32812

Defendant Attorney

JOZWIAK , ERICA LOREN

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/10/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/10/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/10/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/29/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/29/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/29/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/12/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

08/01/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY; Defendant: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY; Defendant: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC; Plaintiff: STOKES, ESTHER; Private Attorney: KAUFFMAN , BRUCE HENRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DNS AUTO GLASS SHOP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant