This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/21/2022 at 09:29:55 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LODGE SERIES IV TRUST vs FRIER, BETTY R

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LODGE SERIES IV TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FRIER, BETTY R. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, X. Jennifer and Gabbard, Jennifer. X. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1102

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LODGE SERIES IV TRUST

Defendants

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

PARKWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE INC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BETTY R FRIER

FRIER, BETTY R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOWARD , HARRIS SETH

KLEIN , MATTHEW BARRY

BROWN , SHAKIVA LAVON

TURTZ , CARLY SKYLAR

RAYMOND , EVAN RUSSELL

Defendant Attorneys

ZACHEM , BETTY C

APPLETON , ERIC NEWELL

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER

03/14/2022: ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER

ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER

03/14/2022: ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER

MOTION TO - FOR

03/04/2022: MOTION TO - FOR

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

01/10/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

LIS PENDENS

02/08/2021: LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/28/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

08/27/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

08/25/2021: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS

08/25/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER; Comment: RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE TO- HOWARD LAW GROUP, 4755 TECHNOLOGY WAY, SUITE #104, BOCA RATON, FL 33431 (ORDER) SIGNED PER ORDER 03/04/22 BY JXG; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LODGE SERIES IV TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OGMTF; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2022119859; Judge: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: RETURN ORIGINALS, RELEASE LIS PENDENS AND DISMISS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED: ORIGINAL NOTE, ORIGINAL ADDENDUM TO NOTE, ENDORSEMENT OF NOTE, ORIGINAL ALLONGE TO NOTES AND ORIGINAL RECORDED MORTGAGE (RECEIVED 01/13/22, MAILED TO THE CLERK BY THE PLAINTIFF); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LODGE SERIES IV TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: ZOOM. Monday, January 24, 2022 @ 9:30 A.M.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less