This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/07/2019 at 15:41:26 (UTC).

DIXON, LEKESHA vs DIXON, TORRANCE

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 DIXON, LEKESHA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DIXON, TORRANCE. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Farfante, D .. Darren. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0222

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Farfante, D .. Darren

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIXON, LEKESHA

Tampa, FL 33610

Respondent

DIXON, TORRANCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (FAMILY); Comment: FJ DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA; Respondent: DIXON, TORRANCE; Date Signed: 05/09/2019; Judicial Officer: Farfante, Darren D .; Vol./Book: 26624, Page: 1432, Number of Pages: 1432

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • COPY OF IDENTIFICATION; Comment: DRIVER LICENSE; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; Additional Info: Respondent: DIXON, TORRANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: W/O PRETRIAL; Additional Info: Date 2: 03/18/2019; Judicial Officer: Farfante, Darren D .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • COPY OF IDENTIFICATION; Comment: DRIVER LICENSE; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Comment: FILE DOCUMENTS; Additional Info: Date Signed: 03/14/2019; Judicial Officer: Farfante, Darren D .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Comment: AS TO NOTICE OF ACTION; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2019
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO; Comment: TORRANCE DIXON 272 E PATTERSON ST TAMPA FL 33604

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • 12 RULES OF COURTROOM BEHAVIOR; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • CIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIXON, LEKESHA

    Read MoreRead Less