This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/12/2020 at 01:39:57 (UTC).

Ditech Financial LLC vs Roque, Raul

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 Ditech Financial LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Roque, Raul. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoddard, C.. Ralph and Judge, Presiding. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1110

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

Judge, Presiding

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ditech Financial LLC

3000 Bayport Drive Suite 880

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendants

Florida Department of Revenue

2450 Shumard Oak Blvd

Tallahassee, FL 32399

The Unknown Spouse of Margarita Roque

Plant City, FL 33565

Bank of America, N.A

1200 S. Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324

Roque, Raul

Foothill Ranch, CA 92610

Kentwood Park Condominium Association, Inc

2906 Busch Lake Blvd

Tampa, FL 33614

The Unknown Spouse of Raul Roque

Foothill Ranch, CA 92610

The Unknown Tenant In Possession

Plant City, FL 33565

Roque, Margarita

Plant City, FL 33565

AROM PROPERTIES LLC

Not Classified By Court

CROIX INVESTMENTS LLC

P O Box 5730 .

Plant City, FL 33563

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMALBACH , HARRISON SAMUEL

Attorney at BIZ2CREDIT

1 Penn Plz Fl 45

New York, NY 10119

HURLEY , STEVEN GARRETT

Attorney at PADGETT LAW GROUP

6267 Old Water Oak Rd Ste 203

Tallahassee, FL 32312

BYARS , DAVID ROBERT

Attorney at PADGETT LAW GROUP

6267 Old Water Oak Rd Ste 203

Tallahassee, FL 32312

Defendant Attorneys

HUDSON , YACENDA KELA

Attorney at TROMBERG LAW GROUP, LLC

1515 S Federal Hwy Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33432

ZIEGLER , MICHAEL ANDREW

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL A ZIEGLER, P.L.: D

2561 Nursery Rd Ste A

Clearwater, FL 33764

FRAZIER , NATHAN A

Attorney at FRAZIER & BOWLES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW

202 S Rome Ave Ste 125

Tampa, FL 33606-1884

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/13/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

01/30/2019: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/07/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

04/04/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

03/13/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/13/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/30/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

LIS PENDENS

01/30/2019: LIS PENDENS

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Additional Info: Successful Bidder: CROIX INVESTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT; Comment: BALANCE PAID; AUCTION BALANCE $52,730.70; CLERK FEES $834.00; DOC STAMPS $385.70; Additional Info: Successful Bidder: CROIX INVESTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • HearingMORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT; Comment: GOOD FAITH DEPOSIT $ 2,755.00; Additional Info: Successful Bidder: CROIX INVESTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketFee Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketCertification of Original Note Possession FS702.015(4); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC

    Read MoreRead Less