This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/25/2019 at 17:26:38 (UTC).

LOANCARE LLC vs HINE, DAVID C, Jr

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 LOANCARE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HINE, DAVID C, Jr. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas, K. Cheryl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1493

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas, K. Cheryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

3000 Bayport Drive Suite 880

Tampa, FL 33607

LOANCARE LLC

Defendants

The Unknown Spouse of Victoria H Hine

Brandon, FL 33510

HINE, VICTORIA H

Brandon, FL 33510

LVNV Funding LLC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

The Unknown Spouse of David C Hine Jr

Brandon, FL 33510

Bank of America NA

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

The Unknown Tenant in possession

Brandon, FL 33510

HINE, DAVID C, Jr

Brandon, FL 33510

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAREY , MOLLY E, Esquire

Attorney at PADGETT LAW GROUP

6267 Old Water Oak Rd Ste 203

Tallahassee, FL 32312-3858

SMALBACH , HARRISON SAMUEL

Attorney at BIZ2CREDIT

1 Penn Plz Fl 45

New York, NY 10119

CAREY , MOLLY EMMA

Attorney at PADGETT LAW GROUP

6267 Old Water Oak Rd Ste 203

Tallahassee, FL 32312-3858

BYARS , DAVID ROBERT

Attorney at PADGETT LAW GROUP

6267 Old Water Oak Rd Ste 203

Tallahassee, FL 32312

Defendant Attorney

BROWN , BENJAMIN BRUCE

Attorney at QUARLES & BRADY L L P

1395 Panther Ln Ste 300

Naples, FL 34109

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

03/13/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/05/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/28/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/28/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

Certification of Original Note Possession FS702.015(4)

02/11/2019: Certification of Original Note Possession FS702.015(4)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

03/29/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/28/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/28/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

02/11/2019: LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: OF FORECLOSURE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LOANCARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: LOANCARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBTITUTE REAL PARTY IN INTEREST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC; Plaintiff: LOANCARE LLC; Date Signed: 08/08/2019; Judicial Officer: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE REAL PARTY IN INTEREST **GRANTED** 08/08/19 CKT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC; Plaintiff: LOANCARE LLC; Date Signed: 08/08/2019; Judicial Officer: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY; Comment: REAL - IN INTEREST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: HINE, DAVID C, Jr; Defendant: HINE, VICTORIA H; Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: HINE, DAVID C, Jr; Defendant: HINE, VICTORIA H; Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertification of Original Note Possession FS702.015(4); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less