Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/17/2021 at 09:49:35 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Zelaya, Carmen

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Discover Bank filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Zelaya, Carmen. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam, Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, Miriam V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6848

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, Miriam V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

P.O. Box 48979

Tampa, FL 33646

Defendant

Zelaya, Carmen

Seffner, FL 33584

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN , ASHLEY LUCIA

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C

Po Box 48979

Tampa, FL 33646

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/28/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

06/17/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/11/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/11/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/11/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Zelaya, Carmen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: CARMEN ZELAYA 06/21/2021; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Zelaya, Carmen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHLEY L BROWN