This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/23/2019 at 06:25:30 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs SINGH, KEOWLAH D

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SINGH, KEOWLAH D. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0358

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

10550 Deerwood Park Blvd, Building 300

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendants

SINGH, KEOWLAH D

Tampa, FL 33647

SINGH, PHAGOO

Tampa, FL 33647

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWN, NATALJA J, Esquire

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

10751 Deerwood Park Blvd Suite 100

Jacksonville, FL 32256

BROWN, NATAIJA JOYCE

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

10751 Deerwood Park Blvd Suite 100

Jacksonville, FL 32256

BROWN , NATAIJA JOYCE

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT, & KISSANE, P.A.

4686 Sunbeam Rd

Jacksonville, FL 32257

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

10/10/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

10/10/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/22/2019: E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/22/2019: E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

04/25/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

04/25/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE

04/03/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE

04/03/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/14/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/14/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/11/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: KEOWLAH D SINGH 10/7/19; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: PHAGOO SINGH; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2 ccharlet@zwickerpc.com ; CourtXpress@firmsolutions.us ; FloridaLitigation@Zwickerpc.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: SINGH, KEOWLAH D; Defendant: SINGH, PHAGOO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2 ccharlet@zwickerpc.com ; CourtXpress@firmsolutions.us ; FloridaLitigation@Zwickerpc.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: KEOWLAH D SINGH; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: PHAGOO SINGH; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Comment: SUMMONS, ALIAS CITATION, CITATION; Additional Info: Defendant: SINGH, PHAGOO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Comment: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: SINGH, KEOWLAH D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 ccharlet@zwickerpc.com ; CourtXpress@firmsolutions.us ; FloridaLitigation@Zwickerpc.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: SINGH, KEOWLAH D; Defendant: SINGH, PHAGOO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 ccharlet@zwickerpc.com ; CourtXpress@firmsolutions.us ; FloridaLitigation@Zwickerpc.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less