Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/14/2021 at 01:32:07 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Rinke, Scott F

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rinke, Scott F. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6570

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Po Box 23200

Louisville, KY 40223-0200

Defendant

Rinke, Scott F

Tampa, FL 33610-1058

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL , ELIZABETH MURANTE

Po Box 23200

Louisville, KY 40223

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/22/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/19/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/19/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/19/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Rinke, Scott F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Rinke, Scott F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SCOTT F RINKE 02/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Rinke, Scott F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL, ELIZABETH MURANTE