This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/21/2022 at 22:40:19 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Gil, Jose A

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gil, Jose A. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James, Giardina, James. S and Moody, S. James. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8378

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

Moody, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant

Gil, Jose A

Tampa, FL 33611-4007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUILES, MICHELLE MARIA

Attorney at RAUSCH STURM LLP

100 2Nd Ave. S Ste 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/10/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/10/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/10/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

12/15/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/15/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

03/31/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: JOSE A GIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022141039; Judge: Giardina, James S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Gil, Jose A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Discover Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quiles, Michelle Maria