This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/23/2019 at 05:47:32 (UTC).

DiSanti, Douglas James vs DiSanti, Ashley Marie

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 DiSanti, Douglas James filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DiSanti, Ashley Marie. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Campbell, D. Lisa, Lefler, Lawrence, Lee, Laurel Moore . and Tibbals, Wesley D.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8995

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Plant City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Campbell, D. Lisa

Lefler, Lawrence

Lee, Laurel Moore .

Tibbals, Wesley D.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DiSanti, Douglas James

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Respondent

DiSanti, Ashley Marie

Lakeland, FL 33805

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CORDOVER , ADAM BRIAN

Attorney at FAMILY DIPLOMACY: COLLABORATIVE LAW FIRM

412 E Madison St Ste 824

Tampa, FL 33602

Respondent Attorney

SAUNDERS , THOMAS C, Esquire

Attorney at SAUNDERS LAW GROUP

Po Box 1279

Bartow, FL 33831

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT NON CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: DiSanti, Douglas James; Respondent: DiSanti, Ashley Marie; Signed: 01/30/2019; Judicial Officer: Lefler, Lawrence; Vol./Book: 26389, Page: 1887, Number of Pages: 1887

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • INITIAL JURISDICTION ORDER; Additional Info: Date 2: 02/04/2019; Judicial Officer: Lefler, Lawrence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED; MSA; Additional Info: Petitioner: DiSanti, Douglas James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED; MSA; Additional Info: Petitioner: DiSanti, Douglas James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING; Comment: UNCONTESTED; Additional Info: Petitioner: DiSanti, Douglas James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Comment: AMENDED; Additional Info: Petitioner: DiSanti, Douglas James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • ORDER SETTING FIRST COLLABORATIVE STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • AFFIDAVIT; Comment: OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Respondent: DiSanti, Ashley Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • MOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; Additional Info: Respondent: DiSanti, Ashley Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2018
  • SRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: DiSanti, Douglas James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: DiSanti, Douglas James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION; Comment: ADAM B. CORDOVER, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF THE PETITIONER; Additional Info: Petitioner: DiSanti, Douglas James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • PETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: DiSanti, Douglas James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • COLLABORATIVE PARTICIPATION AGREEMENT; Comment: COLLABORATIVE PRENUPTIAL; Additional Info: Petitioner: DiSanti, Douglas James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: DiSanti, Douglas James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: DiSanti, Douglas James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Collaborative Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 2 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D.

    Read MoreRead Less