This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/07/2022 at 10:50:14 (UTC).

DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.,Solis, Rodolfo vs STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC ,Solis, Rodolfo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7129

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Solis, Rodolfo

Defendant

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Florida Chief Financial Officer As Registered Agent 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

KAMPF , DAVID B

Attorney at RAMEY & KAMPF, P.A.

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/05/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/05/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/03/2022: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/03/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/03/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/03/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/05/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/05/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/05/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/05/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.; Plaintiff: Solis, Rodolfo; Private Attorney: GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.; Plaintiff: Solis, Rodolfo; Private Attorney: GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.; Plaintiff: Solis, Rodolfo; Private Attorney: GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.; Plaintiff: Solis, Rodolfo; Private Attorney: GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant