Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/10/2021 at 12:52:30 (UTC).

DIPAOLO, CESIRA - Estate

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 DIPAOLO, CESIRA - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0568

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

SORBERA, PAUL

Sarasota, FL 34237

BURGESS, CARLENE

DECARLO, LAURA

STRAUSS, MARISA

SORBERA, LOUIS

Claimants

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

C/O Dcm Services 7601 Penn Ave S, Ste A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

C/O Dcm Services 7601 Penn Ave S Suite A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Po Box 3696 Mac P6053-021

Portland, OR 97208-3696

COMENITY CAPITAL BANK TOYOTA REWARDS VISA

C/O Dcm Services 7601 Penn Ave S Suite A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES, LLC

O/B/O Synchrony Bank-Care Credit 200 Coon Rapid Blvd Suite 200

Coon Rapids, MN 55433-5876

Phillips & Cohen Associates Ltd o/b/o Department Stores National Bank

1004 Justison St

Wilmington, DE 19801

SOUND PHYSICIANS OF FLORIDA IV LLC FLORIDA HOSPIAL TAMPA CC 638B

C/O Dcm Services 7601 Penn Ave S Suite A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

Decedent

DIPAOLO, CESIRA

Lutz, FL 33558

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorneys

ARROYO, ERIK JHOAN

Attorney at BAND GATES & DRAMIS

2070 Ringling Blvd

Sarasota, FL 34237-7002

ARROYO , ERIK JHOAN

Attorney at BAND, GATES & DRAMIS

2070 Ringling Blvd

Sarasota, FL 34237

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: DCM SERVICES 03/17/21; Additional Info: Claimant: SOUND PHYSICIANS OF FLORIDA IV LLC FLORIDA HOSPIAL TAMPA CC 638B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $3185.48, EARROYO@BANDGATESDRAMIS.COM 03/22/21; Additional Info: Claimant: SOUND PHYSICIANS OF FLORIDA IV LLC FLORIDA HOSPIAL TAMPA CC 638B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPET TO DET HOMESTEAD; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SORBERA, PAUL; Petitioner: SORBERA, PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED ORDER FILED; Comment: FILER HAS BEEN NOTIFIED TO CONTACT THE 13TH JUDICIAL HELPDESK FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO UPLOAD ORDERS TO THE ASSIGNED JUDGE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SORBERA, PAUL; Petitioner: SORBERA, PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $182.75, earroyo@bandgatesdramis.com 11/24/20; Additional Info: Claimant: Phillips & Cohen Associates Ltd o/b/o Department Stores National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: O/B/O SYNCHRONY BANK - CARECREDIT $748.90, EARROYO@BANDGATEDRAMIS.COM 10/21/20; Additional Info: Claimant: ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $1196.69, EARROYO@BANDGATESDRAMIS.COM 09/09/20; Additional Info: Claimant: COMENITY CAPITAL BANK TOYOTA REWARDS VISA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: DCM SERVICES 09/04/20; Additional Info: Claimant: COMENITY CAPITAL BANK TOYOTA REWARDS VISA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PETITION; Comment: FOR HOMESTEAD; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SORBERA, PAUL; Petitioner: SORBERA, PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketORDER DET EXEMPT PROPERT

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: CARLENE BURGESS, LAURA DECARLO, LOUIS SORBERA, PAUL SORBERA; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SORBERA, PAUL; Decedent: DIPAOLO, CESIRA; Petitioner: SORBERA, PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SORBERA, PAUL; Petitioner: SORBERA, PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 04/01/20; Additional Info: Claimant: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $381.81, EARROYO@BANDGATESDRAMIS.COM 04/03/2020; Additional Info: Claimant: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: DCM SERVICES 03/25/20; Additional Info: Claimant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $417.60, EARROYO@BANDGATESDRAMIS.COM 03/30/2020; Additional Info: Claimant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPET FOR SUMMARY ADMIN W-O WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SORBERA, PAUL; Petitioner: SORBERA, PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: CARLENE BURGESS, MARISA STRAUSS, LAURA DICARLO, LOUIS SORBERA; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SORBERA, PAUL; Petitioner: SORBERA, PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPET TO DET HOMESTEAD; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SORBERA, PAUL; Petitioner: SORBERA, PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant