Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/28/2019 at 08:50:29 (UTC).

DILLARD, MALKI vs FIGUEROA, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 02/04/2016 DILLARD, MALKI filed an Other lawsuit against FIGUEROA, ROBERT. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, L. Paul and Holder, P. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1095

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, L. Paul

Holder, P. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DILLARD, LORA

Wesley Chapel, FL 33545

TORRES, JOSEPH

New Port Richey, FL 34654

DILLARD, MALKI

Wesley Chapel, FL 33545

Defendants

FIGUEROA, ROBERT

Tampa, FL 33619

JN BOOKING PROMOTION & DISTRIBUTION LLC

2519 Orange Tree Loop

Tampa, FL 33618

Andersen, Jeffrey Carter

Tampa, FL 33601-3913

BISLA AND BISLA LLC

5103 Memorial Hwy

Tampa, FL 33634

AJ CARDINAL GROUP LLC

8810 N. Orangeview

Tampa, FL 33617

ANDRE, JENNINGS

Tampa, FL 33617

MORNI REGENCY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARTES , PETER ANTHONY, II

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TRAGOS, SARTES & TRAGOS

601 Cleveland St Ste 800

Clearwater, FL 33755

Defendant Attorneys

ANDERSEN , JEFFREY CARTER

Attorney at BUSH ROSS, P.A.

Po Box 3913

Tampa, FL 33601

HOLDER , HAROLD DOUGLAS, III

Attorney at BUSH ROSS, P.A.

1801 N Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

TOSH , ELIZABETH C

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/07/2017: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/21/2017: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

EXHIBIT

07/12/2017: EXHIBIT

AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR

07/06/2016: AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

05/05/2016: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/02/2016: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

04/18/2016: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

COMPLAINT

02/04/2016: COMPLAINT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/04/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

EXHIBIT

07/12/2017: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

02/09/2017: EXHIBIT

RESPONSE

09/29/2016: RESPONSE

MOTION TO SET ASIDE

07/05/2016: MOTION TO SET ASIDE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

05/03/2016: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

04/20/2016: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

04/18/2016: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

PROOF OF SERVICE

04/11/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/04/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; Comment: JOINT - WITH PREJUDICE; Additional Info: Defendant: MORNI REGENCY LLC; Plaintiff: DILLARD, LORA; Plaintiff: DILLARD, MALKI; Plaintiff: TORRES, JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT; Comment: TO MORNI REGENCY LLC. - AND OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DILLARD, MALKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Comment: OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF MORNI REGENCY LLC, ON 08/14/18 AT 1:00 PM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DILLARD, MALKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: MORNI REGENCY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Comment: NO OBJECTION AND; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DILLARD, LORA; Plaintiff: DILLARD, MALKI; Plaintiff: TORRES, JOSEPH; Private Attorney: SARTES, PETER A, II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Comment: 17X, COS 05/04/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DILLARD, MALKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 5 petertragos@greeklaw.com ; courtney@greeklaw.com ; stephanie@greeklaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 5 petertragos@greeklaw.com ; courtney@greeklaw.com ; stephanie@greeklaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 5 petertragos@greeklaw.com ; courtney@greeklaw.com ; stephanie@greeklaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 5 petertragos@greeklaw.com ; courtney@greeklaw.com ; stephanie@greeklaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 5 petertragos@greeklaw.com ; courtney@greeklaw.com ; stephanie@greeklaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016497564; Judge: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Judgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2018399437; Judge: Holder, Gregory P

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLDER , HAROLD DOUGLAS, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSEN , JEFFREY CARTER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOSH, ELIZABETH