This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/27/2021 at 00:52:12 (UTC).

Dierker, Colleen vs Marriott International, Inc

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 Dierker, Colleen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Marriott International, Inc. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Cook, J.. Martha, Cook, Martha. J., Nash, C.. Christopher and Nash, Christopher. C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9659

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Cook, J.. Martha

Cook, Martha. J.

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dierker, Colleen

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

Marriott International, Inc

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Scg Hotel, Llc, D/B/A The Vinoy Renaissance St. Petersburg Resort & Golf Club

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Phillips, Kellie Anne

Lakeland, FL 33813

SCG Hotel, LLC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Renaissance Hotel Operating Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POWELL , MATTHEW DOUGLAS

Attorney at MATTLAW

304 S Plant Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-2326

Defendant Attorney

JACOBSON , KARI KATZMAN

Attorney at LA CAVA & JACOBSON, P. A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1250

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING

12/23/2020: ORDER GRANTING

ORDER OF TRANSFER TO

02/08/2021: ORDER OF TRANSFER TO

LETTER FROM

02/18/2021: LETTER FROM

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/11/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/11/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/11/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/10/2020: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/10/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT; Comment: PINELLAS COUNTY - ACCT # 21-000965-CI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketLETTER OF TRANSMITTAL; Comment: PINELLAS COUNTY - TRACKING # 9214 8901 9403 8332 8907 08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM; Comment: ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Private Attorney: POWELL , MATTHEW DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: REQUESTING TRANSFER FEE TO PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: REQUESTING TRANSFER FEE TO PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OOTT; Judgment Description: ORDER OF TRANSFER TO; Instrument Number: 2021065847; Judge: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF TRANSFER TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Additional Info: Defendant: Renaissance Hotel Operating Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Comment: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED - DEEMED FILED PER ORDER 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketORDER; Comment: RATIFYING JOINT STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD NEW PARTY DEFENDANT IN PLACE OF ORIGINAL DEFENDANTS; Additional Info: Defendant: Marriott International, Inc; Defendant: Phillips, Kellie Anne; Defendant: SCG Hotel, LLC; Plaintiff: Dierker, Colleen; Private Attorney: POWELL , MATTHEW DOUGLAS; Date 2: 01/19/2021; Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3; Additional Info: Defendant: Marriott International, Inc; Defendant: Phillips, Kellie Anne; Defendant: SCG Hotel, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dierker, Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dierker, Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dierker, Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dierker, Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dierker, Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Dierker, Colleen

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Renaissance Hotel Operating Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacobson, Kari Katzman