Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/11/2021 at 19:14:50 (UTC).

DIAZ, NITA D vs HUME, BENJAMIN T

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 DIAZ, NITA D filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HUME, BENJAMIN T. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa, Allen, Lisa. A and Allen, Lisa A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5218

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, Lisa A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIAZ, NITA D

Brandon, FL 33511

Respondent

HUME, BENJAMIN T

Brandon, FL 33511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS; Additional Info: Respondent: HUME, BENJAMIN T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingOrder Setting Hearing; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 306 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketORDER DENYING PETITION; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIAZ, NITA D; Respondent: HUME, BENJAMIN T; Date Signed: 05/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: ODNP-ORDER DENYING PETITION; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIAZ, NITA D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCOPIES SENT TO; Comment: ORDER; Additional Info: Respondent: HUME, BENJAMIN T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ORDER, AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING; Additional Info: Respondent: HUME, BENJAMIN T; Date Served: 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIAZ, NITA D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ORDER, AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING; Additional Info: Respondent: HUME, BENJAMIN T; Date Served: 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIAZ, NITA D

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNON-LAWYER DISCLOSURE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPARTY SIGNED UP FOR SMS TEXT MESSAGING; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIAZ, NITA D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: Based on the facts stated in your petition, the court has set a hearing to take testimony and make a ruling on the petition. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. A supplemental petition with additiona; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIAZ, NITA D; Respondent: HUME, BENJAMIN T; Date 2: 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIAZ, NITA D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less