This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/19/2019 at 05:54:17 (UTC).

DIAMOND, DELANEY PAIGE vs DIAMOND, STEVEN CLARK

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 DIAMOND, DELANEY PAIGE filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DIAMOND, STEVEN CLARK. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are McNeil, Artemeus and Weis, Richard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8358

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

McNeil, Artemeus

Weis, Richard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIAMOND, DELANEY PAIGE

Valrico, FL 33594

Respondent

DIAMOND, STEVEN CLARK

Apollo Beach, FL 33527

Not Classified By Court

CONTE, COURTNEY LYNN

Valrico, FL 33594

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HAYES , JULIAN ANDREW, Jr

Po Box 271682

Tampa, FL 33688

Respondent Attorney

BYRD , JOHNNIE B, Jr

Attorney at BYRD & BARNHILL, P.L.

206 N Collins St

Plant City, FL 33563

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2019
  • FILE RECEIVED AT RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE; Comment: 1vol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • RETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • FILE SENT TO REC CTR FROM PC FOR STORAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • COURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION (FAMILY) AFTER HEARING; Additional Info: Mother Next Best Friend: CONTE, COURTNEY LYNN; Petitioner: DIAMOND, DELANEY PAIGE; Respondent: DIAMOND, STEVEN CLARK; Date Signed: 02/05/2019; Judicial Officer: McNeil, Artemeus; Vol./Book: 26393, Page: 572, Number of Pages: 572

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • COURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING; Additional Info: Date Signed: 12/11/2018; Judicial Officer: McNeil, Artemeus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Respondent: DIAMOND, STEVEN CLARK; Date Served: 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • SHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ORDER, PETITION, ORDER SETTING HEARING, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: DIAMOND, STEVEN CLARK; Date Served: 12/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INTAKE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS PLANT CITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • SRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • STAY AWAY FROM; Comment: LENNARD HIGH SCHOOL 2342 SHELL PLANT PLANT RD., E RUSKIN FL 33510; 1109 SHANNON AVE PLANT CITY FL 33563

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • NON-LAWYER DISCLOSURE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • INJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: Based on the facts stated in your petition, the court has set a hearing to take testimony and make a ruling on the petition. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. A supplemental petition with additiona; Additional Info: Petitioner: DIAMOND, DELANEY PAIGE; Respondent: DIAMOND, STEVEN CLARK; Date 2: 11/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Order Setting Hearing; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 1 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: McNeil, Artemeus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Order Setting Hearing; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 1 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: McNeil, Artemeus

    Read MoreRead Less