Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/18/2021 at 05:59:19 (UTC).

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A.,NELSON, ZACHARY vs Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St Petersburg, P A ,NELSON, ZACHARY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle and Ober, Joelle. Ann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7093

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A. D/B/A Diagnostic Imaging Consultants A/A/O Zachary Nelson

Tampa, FL 33606

NELSON, ZACHARY

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A.

Tampa, FL 33606

DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS

Defendant

Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIVALE , LORCA

Attorney at THE PHYSICIAN COLLECTIONS GROUP P A

701 S Howard Ave Ste 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

PLAZA RIOS , YOLANDA

Attorney at ROIG LAWYERS

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 13500

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT

05/05/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/21/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: PARTIAL - AND / OR DISPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A.; Plaintiff: NELSON, ZACHARY; Plaintiff Doing Business As: DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO SECOND DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Comment: TO DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A.; Plaintiff: NELSON, ZACHARY; Plaintiff Doing Business As: DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: (PARTIAL); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A.; Plaintiff: NELSON, ZACHARY; Plaintiff Doing Business As: DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIVALE , LORCA