This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/26/2022 at 14:15:16 (UTC).

DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS OF ST. PETERSBURG, P.A.,Fallon, Timothy vs Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS OF ST PETERSBURG, P A ,Fallon, Timothy filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, S. Susan and Lopez, Susan. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6003

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A. D/B/A Diagnostic Imaging Consultants A/A/O Timothy Fallon

Tampa, FL 33606

DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS

DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS OF ST. PETERSBURG, P.A.

Tampa, FL 33606

Fallon, Timothy

Defendant

Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIVALE , LORCA

Attorney at THE PHYSICIAN COLLECTIONS GROUP P A

701 S Howard Ave Ste 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

PARRINO , ANTHONY JOSEPH

Attorney at REYNOLDS PARRINO SHADWICK, P.A,

8950 Dr Martin Luther King Jr St N Ste 220

Saint Petersburg, FL 33702

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/27/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/31/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/31/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/03/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/22/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS OF ST. PETERSBURG, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS OF ST. PETERSBURG, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS OF ST. PETERSBURG, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS OF ST. PETERSBURG, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIVALE , LORCA