This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/01/2021 at 00:48:04 (UTC).

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.,Miller, Roseann vs Geico Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St Petersburg, P A ,Miller, Roseann filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico Indemnity Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1707

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A. D/B/A Diagnostic Imaging Consultants A/A/O Roseann Miller

Tampa, FL 33606

DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

Tampa, FL 33606

Miller, Roseann

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra Service Of Process Section Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIVALE , LORCA

Attorney at THE PHYSICIAN COLLECTIONS GROUP P A

701 S Howard Ave Ste 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

PAFITES , ANDREW JOSEPH GEORGE, Jr

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/30/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/28/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/28/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIVALE , LORCA