Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/05/2021 at 18:05:52 (UTC).

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.,Caplinger, Johnathan vs United Services Automobile Association

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St Petersburg, P A ,Caplinger, Johnathan filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United Services Automobile Association. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott, M. Monique and Scott, Monique. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7081

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Scott, M. Monique

Scott, Monique. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A. D/B/A Diagnostic Imaging Consultants A/A/O Johnathan Caplinger

Tampa, FL 33606

Caplinger, Johnathan

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

Tampa, FL 33606

DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS

Defendant

United Services Automobile Association

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIVALE , LORCA

Attorney at THE PHYSICIAN COLLECTIONS GROUP P A

701 S Howard Ave Ste 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

PETRI, DANIEL JOHN

Attorney at ROIG LAWYERS

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1350

Tampa, FL 33602-5342

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/14/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/21/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Comment: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Caplinger, Johnathan; Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.; Plaintiff Doing Business As: DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: (PARTIAL); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Caplinger, Johnathan; Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.; Plaintiff Doing Business As: DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: FOR UNITED STATES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (CASE STYLE DOES NOT MATCH AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: United Services Automobile Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St. Petersburg, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIVALE , LORCA