This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/16/2022 at 14:17:55 (UTC).

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A,Alonso, Alfredo vs Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St Petersburg, P A,Alonso, Alfredo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, Joseph. M and Tompkins, M. Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6002

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alonso, Alfredo

DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CONSULTANTS

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra Service Of Process Section Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIVALE , LORCA

Attorney at THE PHYSICIAN COLLECTIONS GROUP P A

701 S Howard Ave Ste 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

PARRINO , ANTHONY JOSEPH

Attorney at REYNOLDS PARRINO SHADWICK, P.A,

8950 Dr Martin Luther King Jr St N Ste 220

Saint Petersburg, FL 33702

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/27/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/31/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/31/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/02/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/17/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/22/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants Of St. Petersburg, P.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIVALE , LORCA