This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/23/2022 at 14:09:10 (UTC).

DESAIGOUDAR, SHERRI vs iMEDIA BRANDS, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 DESAIGOUDAR, SHERRI filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against iMEDIA BRANDS, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3725

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DESAIGOUDAR, SHERRI

Defendant

iMEDIA BRANDS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAPA, FRANK THOMAS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/07/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/07/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/07/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/07/2021: COMPLAINT

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

09/08/2021: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/08/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

10/01/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/11/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/11/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022036125; Judge: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DESAIGOUDAR, SHERRI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DESAIGOUDAR, SHERRI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DESAIGOUDAR, SHERRI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TIM PETERMAN 9/23/21; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DESAIGOUDAR, SHERRI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: iMEDIA BRANDS, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DESAIGOUDAR, SHERRI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DESAIGOUDAR, SHERRI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DESAIGOUDAR, SHERRI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DESAIGOUDAR, SHERRI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less