Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/31/2021 at 20:49:22 (UTC).

DENNIS, BETTIE JEAN - Estate

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 DENNIS, BETTIE JEAN - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, Vivian. T and Corvo, T. Vivian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1356

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, Vivian. T

Corvo, T. Vivian

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

KAHL, AARON ALAN

Ruskin, FL 33570

BELCHER, VIRGINIA

Clayton, GA 30525

JEFFERY, DONALD

Ruskin, FL 33570

DENNIS, BRIAN

Springfield, MO 65804

Decedent

DENNIS, BETTIE JEAN

Ruskin, FL 33570

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

CAROLAN , KARLA MARIE

Attorney at ALL LIFE LEGAL, P.A.

10009 Park Place Ave

Riverview, FL 33578

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS; Additional Info: Decedent: DENNIS, BETTIE JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: 1ST PUB: 05/14/21; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: CAROLAN , KARLA MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL-APPT PR; Comment: BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Personal Representative: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Petitioner: KAHL, AARON ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Personal Representative: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Petitioner: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Date 2: 05/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Additional Info: Decedent: DENNIS, BETTIE JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Personal Representative: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Petitioner: KAHL, AARON ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM; Comment: KARLA MARIE CAROLAN, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: DONALD JEFFERY; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Personal Representative: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Petitioner: KAHL, AARON ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: VIRIGINIA GINGER BELCHER; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Personal Representative: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Petitioner: KAHL, AARON ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: BRIAN DENNIS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Personal Representative: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Petitioner: KAHL, AARON ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Personal Representative: KAHL, AARON ALAN; Petitioner: KAHL, AARON ALAN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARLA MARIE CAROLAN