This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/02/2021 at 04:15:04 (UTC).

Deer Valley Corporation vs Todd Rosner

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 Deer Valley Corporation filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Todd Rosner. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Farfante, D. Darren and Farfante, Darren. D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6255

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Farfante, D. Darren

Farfante, Darren. D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deer Valley Corporation

1801 N. Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

Albert D. Richards TTEE, Alambic Invst Mgmt 401K

Belevedere, CA 94920

FMTC Custodian - Roth IRA f/b/o Albert Richards

Jersey City, NJ 07130

Gary and Cynthia Chandler, JTWROS

Phoenix, MD 21131

Gary Chandler, Rollover IRA

Phoenix, MD 21131

Noland, Andrew Montgomery

Louisville, KY 40222

Rhonda Rosner f/b/o Mason Rosner

Andover, ME 01810

Richards, Albert

Belevedere, CA 94920

Rosner, Todd

Andover, ME 01810

Rosner, Rhonda

Andover, ME 01810

Alambic Invst Mgmt 401K

Albert D. Richards TTEE

Belevedere, CA 94920

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO.

INTERACTIVE BROKERS LLC

JTWROS

NATIONAL FINANCIAL SERVICE, LLC

ROLLOVER IRA

TD AMERITRADE INC.

TD AMERITRADE, INC.

UBS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOWDEN , DALE MICHAEL

Attorney at BUSH ROSS, P.A.

1801 N Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

SBAR , JONATHAN BRETT

Attorney at ROCKE MCLEAN & SBAR, P.A.

2309 S Macdill Ave

Tampa, FL 33629-5918

SNYDERBURN , PHILIP JOHN

Attorney at SNYDERBURN, RISHOI & SWANN, LLP

1920 N Orange Ave Ste 200

Orlando, FL 32804

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

07/30/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/30/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/30/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING

11/03/2021: CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING

CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING

11/02/2021: CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/15/2021: ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/29/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER

09/16/2021: ANSWER

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/16/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

INTERROGATORIES

09/16/2021: INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/16/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER

09/15/2021: ANSWER

ANSWER

09/15/2021: ANSWER

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/27/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/26/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AMENDED PETITION

08/26/2021: AMENDED PETITION

LETTER TO

08/02/2021: LETTER TO

LETTER TO

08/02/2021: LETTER TO

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: FOR APPOINTMENT OF APPRIASER PURSUANT TO 607.1330(4), FLA. STAT W/O PREJ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Deer Valley Corporation; Date 2: 11/15/2021; Judicial Officer: Farfante, Darren D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketORDER ON; Comment: CHANDLER RESPONDENTS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND APPOINTMENT OF APPRAISER 11/15/21 DDF; Additional Info: Defendant: Gary and Cynthia Chandler, JTWROS; Defendant: Gary Chandler, Rollover IRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketORDER ON; Comment: RICHARDS AND NOLAND RESPONDENTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: Deer Valley Corporation's Motion For Appointment Of Appraisers Pursuant to 607.1330(4), Fla. Stat. 11/10/2021 @10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION; Comment: OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: FOR APPOINTMENT OF APPRAISER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Deer Valley Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: Chandler Respondents Motion to Compel Discovery And For Appointment Of Appraisers (Clerk Index No. 23 E-filed on October 30, 2021). 11/10/2021 @10:30AM; Additional Info: Defendant: Gary and Cynthia Chandler, JTWROS; Defendant: Gary Chandler, Rollover IRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Gary and Cynthia Chandler, JTWROS; Defendant: Gary Chandler, Rollover IRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: Gary and Cynthia Chandler, JTWROS; Defendant: Gary Chandler, Rollover IRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Albert D. Richards TTEE; Defendant: Noland, Andrew Montgomery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Albert D. Richards TTEE; Defendant: FMTC Custodian - Roth IRA f/b/o Albert Richards; Defendant: Noland, Andrew Montgomery; Defendant: Richards, Albert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: NO COS / EXHIBITS ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: EXTRA DEFENDANTS FEE - ddowden@bushross.com ; ksalter@bushross.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: EXTRA DEFENDANTS FEE - ddowden@bushross.com ; ksalter@bushross.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Deer Valley Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Deer Valley Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Deer Valley Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Financial Services, Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERACTIVE BROKERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TD AMERITRADE, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UBS Financial Services Inc. is a litigant