This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/13/2023 at 11:34:13 (UTC).

De Grange, Lawrence - Estate

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 De Grange, Lawrence - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4435

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

Dever, Debra Ann

Lake City, FL 32025

De Grange, Lawrence Charles

De Grange, Rose Florence

El Portal, FL 33138

Decedent

De Grange, Lawrence

Tampa, FL 33616

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

MCGINNIS , ELAINE NOELLE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ELAINE MCGINNIS, P.A.

324 N Dale Mabry Hwy Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33609

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Dever, Debra Ann; Petitioner: Dever, Debra Ann;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Dever, Debra Ann; Petitioner: Dever, Debra Ann;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCOPY OF INFORMAL REQUEST FROM; Comment: CG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS; Additional Info: Decedent: De Grange, Lawrence;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Dever, Debra Ann; Petitioner: Dever, Debra Ann;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED VIA ACH - eCERTIFY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERS REP; Comment: BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Dever, Debra Ann; Petitioner: Dever, Debra Ann;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Dever, Debra Ann; Petitioner: Dever, Debra Ann; Date 2: 01/03/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 12/15/22; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: MCGINNIS , ELAINE NOELLE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Dever, Debra Ann; Petitioner: Dever, Debra Ann;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Dever, Debra Ann; Petitioner: Dever, Debra Ann;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Comment: DEBRA ANN DEVER; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Dever, Debra Ann; Petitioner: Dever, Debra Ann;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less