This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/24/2019 at 12:33:01 (UTC).

DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC vs HARVEST TAMPA LLC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HARVEST TAMPA LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Battles, L. Emmett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0224

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Battles, L. Emmett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC

546 Nw 77Th Street

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendants

HARVEST TAMPA LLC

21 W. Washington Street Washington Squate - Suites E And F

West Chester, PA 19380

TAMPA WESTSHORE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

200 East Long Lake Road Suite 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304-2324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIER , SIMEON DANIEL

Attorney at COZEN OCONNOR

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4410

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

CURTIN , KENNETH M, Esquire

Attorney at ADAMS AND REESE, LLP

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 4000

Tampa, FL 33602

CURTIN , KENNETH MICHAEL

Attorney at ADAMS AND REESE, LLP

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 4000

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/26/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/03/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/17/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

01/09/2019: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

01/09/2019: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

LIS PENDENS

01/08/2019: LIS PENDENS

LIS PENDENS

01/08/2019: LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/07/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS

01/07/2019: LIS PENDENS

LIS PENDENS

01/07/2019: LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

01/07/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/07/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSTATUS REPORT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketAGREED ORDER; Comment: DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE A STATUS REPORT W/ THE COURT THREE (3) MONTHS AFTER THE ENTERY OF THIS ORDER AND AS FURTHER SET FORTH HEREIN; Additional Info: Defendant: HARVEST TAMPA LLC; Defendant: TAMPA WESTSHORE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Plaintiff: DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC; Private Attorney: BRIER , SIMEON DANIEL; Private Attorney: CURTIN , KENNETH M, Esquire; Date Signed: 08/19/2019; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR STAY OF ACTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA WESTSHORE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Date 2: 05/29/2019; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: (SECOND MOTION) TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA WESTSHORE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: TAMPA WESTSHORE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S RENEWED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA WESTSHORE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Date Signed: 05/15/2019; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TAMPA WESTSHORE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP S RENEWED TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA WESTSHORE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT DENIED W.O PREJ 0; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA WESTSHORE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Date 2: 05/07/2019; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA WESTSHORE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: HARVEST TAMPA LLC; Defendant: TAMPA WESTSHORE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Plaintiff: DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC; Vol./Book: 26333, Page: 156, Number of Pages: 156

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Defendant: HARVEST TAMPA LLC; Defendant: TAMPA WESTSHORE ASSOCIATES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Plaintiff: DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC; Vol./Book: 26334, Page: 948, Number of Pages: 948

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Comment: AMENDED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: sbrier@cozen.com ; lmurphy@cozen.com ; kdaugharty@cozen.com ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC

    Read MoreRead Less