This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/20/2020 at 18:31:48 (UTC).

Davis, Damian C vs Odom, Donald R.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 Davis, Damian C filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Odom, Donald R. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0271

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Davis, Damian C

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendants

Odom, Donald R.

Riverview, FL 33579

Walton Morgan, Karin L

Tampa, FL 33610

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLS , KIM EDWIN

Attorney at WELLS LAW GROUP

1211 Tech Blvd Ste 149

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant Attorney

UCCELLO , JOSEPH PAUL

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ELLEN H. EHRENPREIS

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/21/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE

02/10/2020: NOTICE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

12/17/2019: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/14/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/06/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/21/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/07/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/07/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/08/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/02/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/22/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/12/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

10/28/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF FILING

11/21/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/30/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/07/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/07/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

10/07/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis, Damian C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Odom, Donald R.; Defendant: Walton Morgan, Karin L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Odom, Donald R.; Defendant: Walton Morgan, Karin L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis, Damian C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Walton Morgan, Karin L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Odom, Donald R.; Defendant: Walton Morgan, Karin L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis, Damian C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis, Damian C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Odom, Donald R.; Defendant: Walton Morgan, Karin L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Odom, Donald R.; Defendant: Walton Morgan, Karin L

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2 kwells@thewellslawgroup.com ; dmason@thewellslawgroup.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Odom, Donald R.; Defendant: Walton Morgan, Karin L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2 kwells@thewellslawgroup.com ; dmason@thewellslawgroup.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis, Damian C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis, Damian C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis, Damian C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis, Damian C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis, Damian C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis, Damian C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Davis, Damian C

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer UCCELLO , JOSEPH PAUL