This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/18/2022 at 18:19:47 (UTC).

DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC vs WILLIAMS, DENAE A

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WILLIAMS, DENAE A. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1756

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC DBA VER

1250 Skipper Road

Tampa, FL 33613

DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC

1250 Skipper Road

Tampa, FL 33613

VERRA NORTH APARTMENTS

Defendant

WILLIAMS, DENAE A

Tampa, FL 33613

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRUIKSHANK , ELIZABETH MARIE

Attorney at CRUIKSHANK ERSIN, LLC

6065 Roswell Rd Ste 680

Atlanta, GA 30328

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/04/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

ANSWER

04/18/2022: ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DENAE A. WILLIAMS 04/09/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: WILLIAMS, DENAE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERRA NORTH APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK