This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/17/2022 at 01:26:04 (UTC).

DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC vs LOPEZ, NATALIA REYES

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOPEZ, NATALIA REYES. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4730

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC

1250 Skipper Road

Tampa, FL 33613

VERRA NORTH APARTMENTS

Defendant

LOPEZ, NATALIA REYES

Tampa, FL 33613

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRUIKSHANK , ELIZABETH MARIE

Attorney at CRUIKSHANK ERSIN, LLC

6065 Roswell Rd Ste 680

Atlanta, GA 30328

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/15/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/15/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

05/04/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Comment: NATALIA REYES LOPEZ 04/28/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC; Plaintiff Doing Business As: VERRA NORTH APARTMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: LOPEZ, NATALIA REYES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DASMEN RESIDENTIAL LLC OBO JASMINE 319 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERRA NORTH APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Dasmen Residential LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK