This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/28/2023 at 23:11:13 (UTC).

Das, Manoj K vs Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Das, Manoj K filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, Christopher. C., Nash, C.. Christopher and Nash, Christopher C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6790

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Das, Nivedita

Das, Manoj K

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC

3Rd Party Defendants

ACR FAMILY CONSTRUCTION, INC.

AMERICAN BUILDERS SUPPLY, INC.

AP GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC.

BJ ALUMINUM SERVICES, INC.

DALE HAYES MASONRY, INC.

Z-WRAP OF FLORIDA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNETT , JOSHUA EVAN

Defendant Attorneys

KLAPSA , KATHERINE LEE

KIMSEY , VICTORIA ASHLEY

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

MARINO , JENNIFER LYNN

SOMJI , MOHAMED Z

KATZ , JEFFREY MARK

AMITRANO , SCOTT S

KAPSALES , PETER J

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/21/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

08/18/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/17/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/17/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/21/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/21/2023: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/31/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

08/18/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/07/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

CERTIFICATE OF

11/27/2023: CERTIFICATE OF

CERTIFICATE OF

11/27/2023: CERTIFICATE OF

CERTIFICATE OF

11/21/2023: CERTIFICATE OF

PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

11/21/2023: PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/17/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER GRANTING

10/27/2023: ORDER GRANTING

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/27/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/27/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/27/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF; Comment: AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: BJ ALUMINUM SERVICES, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF; Comment: AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF; Comment: AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: DALE HAYES MASONRY, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Das, Manoj K; Plaintiff: Das, Nivedita;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2023

DocketEXHIBIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: DALE HAYES MASONRY, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: DALE HAYES MASONRY, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: *AGREED* JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S DEFAULT ENTERED ON AUGUST 21, 2023 AS TO THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT AMERICAN BUILDERS SUPPLY, INC; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: AMERICAN BUILDERS SUPPLY, INC.; Date Signed: 10/27/2023; Judicial Officer:: Nash, Christopher C.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: DALE HAYES MASONRY, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
08/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022

DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less