This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 04:51:24 (UTC).

Daniels, Gregory A. vs Carbone, Andrew D.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Daniels, Gregory A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Carbone, Andrew D. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, X. Jennifer, Gabbard, Jennifer. X and Gabbard, Jennifer X. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3937

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Gabbard, Jennifer X

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniels, Gregory A.

Tampa, FL 33604

Defendants

Carbone, Andrew D.

New Port Richey, FL 34654

Herc Rentals, Inc.

C/O Ct Corporation System 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYD , CHRISTOPHER AARON

Attorney at BUTLER & BOYD, P.A.

201 N Franklin St Ste 2880

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

CRISCUOLO, MATTHEW B

Attorney at COZEN OCONNOR

1 N Clematis St Ste 510

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

09/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/15/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/26/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/26/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

08/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

08/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/01/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/01/2022: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/01/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/12/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/12/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/12/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/12/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/12/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/12/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/12/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/12/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/12/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/94004094230 MEETING ID 940 0409 4230 Judicial Officer: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Daniels, Gregory A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Daniels, Gregory A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Carbone, Andrew D.; Defendant: Herc Rentals, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Carbone, Andrew D.; Defendant: Herc Rentals, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Carbone, Andrew D.; Defendant: Herc Rentals, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Carbone, Andrew D.; Defendant: Herc Rentals, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Carbone, Andrew D.; Defendant: Herc Rentals, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Carbone, Andrew D.; Defendant: Herc Rentals, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Carbone, Andrew D.; Defendant: Herc Rentals, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Daniels, Gregory A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Daniels, Gregory A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Daniels, Gregory A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Daniels, Gregory A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Daniels, Gregory A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Daniels, Gregory A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Daniels, Gregory A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Carbone, Andrew D.; Defendant: Herc Rentals, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Herc Rentals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRISCUOLO, MATTHEW B